TX HB3985 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the liability of certain social workers who provide volunteer health care services to charitable organizations.
Title
Relating to the liability of certain social workers who provide volunteer health care services to charitable organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-27 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Health Care Providers
SOCIAL WORK & SOCIAL WORKERS
VOLUNTEERS
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Health Care Providers
SOCIAL WORK & SOCIAL WORKERS
VOLUNTEERS