TX HB3978 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution of the offenses of sexual assault and aggravated sexual assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution of the offenses of sexual assault and aggravated sexual assault.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-03HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-04-03HouseRead first time
2017-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback