TX HB3976 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authorized activities of a manufacturer's agent's warehousing permit holder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authorized activities of a manufacturer's agent's warehousing permit holder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-13SenateRead first time
2021-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#951
2021-05-11HousePassed
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-06HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-03HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback