TX HB3974 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the residence address of a voter for purposes of a response to a confirmation notice sent by the voter registrar.
Title
Relating to the residence address of a voter for purposes of a response to a confirmation notice sent by the voter registrar.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Elections |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1111 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21