TX HB3961 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 1/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to required posting of information regarding the office of the state long-term care ombudsman on certain long-term care facilities' Internet websites.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to required posting of information regarding the office of the state long-term care ombudsman on certain long-term care facilities' Internet websites.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1549 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#510 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective on 1/1/22
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1549
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-20HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-20HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-20HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-20SenateRecord vote
2021-05-20SenatePassed
2021-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-20SenateRecord vote
2021-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-04SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-05-04SenateRead first time
2021-04-28SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-28HouseRecord vote RV#510
2021-04-28HousePassed
2021-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-27HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-27HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-16HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3961
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03961I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03961H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03961E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03961S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03961F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03961I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03961H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03961H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03961E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03961E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03961S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03961S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03961F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3961&RcdVtNo=510&Ch=H&Dt=04/28/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-20-F.PDF#page=14
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3961&RcdVtNo=1549&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments

feedback