TX HB3959 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of the Texas youth livestock show grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of the Texas youth livestock show grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1067 (Y: 110 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08 Effective immediately
2021-06-08 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-24HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-05-14SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1067
2021-05-13HousePassed
2021-05-13HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-12HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-12HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-12HouseAmended 2-Buckley, Burns, Anderson, Murr, Ellzey, K. Bell, Geren, Cyrier, K. King, Price, Spiller, More
2021-05-12HouseAmended 1-Buckley
2021-05-12HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3959
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03959I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03959H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03959E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03959S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03959F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03959H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03959H22.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03959I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03959H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03959H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03959E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03959E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3959&RcdVtNo=1067&Ch=H&Dt=05/13/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=11

Bill Comments 750

feedback