TX HB3951 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the functions of the Texas Department of Transportation relating to aircraft owned or leased by the state; authorizing an increase in rates charged for the use of state aircraft to provide for the acquisition of replacement aircraft.
Title
Relating to the functions of the Texas Department of Transportation relating to aircraft owned or leased by the state; authorizing an increase in rates charged for the use of state aircraft to provide for the acquisition of replacement aircraft.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Aviation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Aviation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3951 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03951I.htm |