TX HB3935 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to funding law enforcement training for veterans from state and federal funds or grants.
Title
Relating to funding law enforcement training for veterans from state and federal funds or grants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2015-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Military & Veterans
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
State Finances
State Finances--Budget
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Military & Veterans
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
State Finances
State Finances--Budget