TX HB3934 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to enhancing the punishment for certain conduct constituting the criminal offense of aggravated assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to enhancing the punishment for certain conduct constituting the criminal offense of aggravated assault.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-24HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback