TX HB393 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the definition of a bet for purposes of gambling criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to the definition of a bet for purposes of gambling criminal offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB592 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce