TX HB3927 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain temporary motor vehicle tags.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain temporary motor vehicle tags.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1590 (Y: 125 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#882 (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1590
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed
2021-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenateAmended
2021-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Nichols
2021-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-05-12SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#882
2021-05-07HousePassed
2021-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-07HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-07HouseAmended 1-Hefner
2021-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-24HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3927
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03927I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03927E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03927S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03927F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03927H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03927S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03927I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03927H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03927E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03927E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03927S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03927S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03927F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3927&RcdVtNo=882&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=51
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3927&RcdVtNo=1590&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback