TX HB3925 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to pedestrian use of a sidewalk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to pedestrian use of a sidewalk.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-24HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback