TX HB3923 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to multiple employer welfare arrangements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to multiple employer welfare arrangements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#734 (Y: 93 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-21SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#734
2021-05-05HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24HouseReferred to Insurance
2021-03-24HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3923
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03923I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03923H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03923E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03923S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03923I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03923H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03923H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03923E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03923E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3923&RcdVtNo=734&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback