TX HB3919 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of certain municipalities to establish homestead preservation districts and reinvestment zones and to certain regulatory prohibitions applicable in those districts and zones.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of certain municipalities to establish homestead preservation districts and reinvestment zones and to certain regulatory prohibitions applicable in those districts and zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1078 (Y: 89 N: 55 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
Housing
Housing--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
REINVESTMENT ZONES
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
Housing
Housing--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
REINVESTMENT ZONES