TX HB390 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to defense economic readjustment zones.
Title
Relating to defense economic readjustment zones.
Sponsors
Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Rep. John Frullo [R] | Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] |
Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#624 (Y: 110 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Amended RV#563 (Y: 118 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Amended RV#563 (Y: 118 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#624 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#563 |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-23 | House | Amended 1-Frullo |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT BANK, TEXAS
Military & Veterans
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT BANK, TEXAS
Military & Veterans