TX HB3897 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to fees levied by municipalities and counties for certain alcoholic beverage licenses.
Title
Relating to fees levied by municipalities and counties for certain alcoholic beverage licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1561 (Y: 114 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-16 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2021-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1561 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#951 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverage Regulation
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
PERMITS
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
PERMITS