TX HB3896 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to access to certain financial records by the guardianship abuse, fraud, and exploitation deterrence program.
Title
Relating to access to certain financial records by the guardianship abuse, fraud, and exploitation deterrence program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB692 (Same As) 2021-05-30 - Effective immediately