TX HB3885 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to a study of the effectiveness of the success initiative assessment and developmental coursework requirements and the implementation of a pilot program regarding student readiness for college-level work.
Title
Relating to a study of the effectiveness of the success initiative assessment and developmental coursework requirements and the implementation of a pilot program regarding student readiness for college-level work.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-29 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-22 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-22 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
EDUCATION--HIGHER--ASSESSMENT & TESTING
Education--Higher--State Coordination
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Interim Studies
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
EDUCATION--HIGHER--ASSESSMENT & TESTING
Education--Higher--State Coordination
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Interim Studies