TX HB3881 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of epinephrine auto-injectors in primary and secondary schools.
Title
Relating to the use of epinephrine auto-injectors in primary and secondary schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#725 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#725 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety