TX HB388 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of real property leased to and used by certain schools.
Title
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of real property leased to and used by certain schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1201 (Y: 114 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#1159 (Y: 95 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1158 (Y: 63 N: 77 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1157 (Y: 43 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#1159 (Y: 95 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1158 (Y: 63 N: 77 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1157 (Y: 43 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1201 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1159 |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-08 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) |
2019-05-08 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(b)(9) |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment withdrawn 6-Capriglione |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 5-Goodwin |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment withdrawn 4-Bailes |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 3-Hinojosa |
2019-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1158 |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 2-Hinojosa |
2019-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1157 |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-J. González |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR31 (Enabling for) 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
SB2345 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - Not again placed on intent calendar
SB2345 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions