TX HB3879 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to nonlawyer representation in an appeal of an eviction suit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to nonlawyer representation in an appeal of an eviction suit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1974 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Passed (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-26HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-26SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2017-05-25SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-25SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-25SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-25HouseHouse requests conference committee
2017-05-25HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenatePassed
2017-05-23SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-27HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-25HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-31HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2017-03-31HouseRead first time
2017-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback