TX HB387 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Placed on local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to submission of reports by an advanced practice registered nurse under the workers' compensation system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to submission of reports by an advanced practice registered nurse under the workers' compensation system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#374 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-02SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-02SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-04-17SenateRead first time
2019-04-16SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#374
2019-04-16HousePassed
2019-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-15HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1022 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback