TX HB387 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of general-law municipalities to restrict sex offenders from child safety zones in the municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of general-law municipalities to restrict sex offenders from child safety zones in the municipality.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2017-02-16HouseRead first time
2016-11-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback