TX HB387 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the extension of additional state aid for tax reduction provided to certain school districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the extension of additional state aid for tax reduction provided to certain school districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-08-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-08-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-08-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-08-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-08-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-08-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-08-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-08-08HousePosting rule suspended
2017-08-08HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-08-08HouseRead first time
2017-08-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback