TX HB3865 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authority of certain general-law municipalities to annex an area on petition by owners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authority of certain general-law municipalities to annex an area on petition by owners.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-23HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2015-03-23HouseRead first time
2015-03-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback