TX HB3862 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted codes, to the nonsubstantive codification or disposition of various laws omitted from enacted codes, and to conforming codifications enacted by the 82nd Legislature to other Acts of that legislature.
Title
Relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted codes, to the nonsubstantive codification or disposition of various laws omitted from enacted codes, and to conforming codifications enacted by the 82nd Legislature to other Acts of that legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-05-02 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-11 | House | Printing rule suspended |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as amended |
2013-04-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment(s) considered in committee |
2013-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform |
2013-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-13 | House | Filed |
2013-03-13 | House | Record vote |
2013-03-13 | House | Permission to introduce |