TX HB3855 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to erecting or maintaining certain outdoor signs regulated by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Title
Relating to erecting or maintaining certain outdoor signs regulated by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |