TX HB3851 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to policies and training regarding the use of epinephrine auto-injectors by public institutions of higher education; providing immunity.
Title
Relating to policies and training regarding the use of epinephrine auto-injectors by public institutions of higher education; providing immunity.
Sponsors
Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Philip Cortez [D] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] |
Rep. Stephanie Klick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Faculty
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHYSICIANS
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Faculty
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHYSICIANS
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING