TX HB3842 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of certain motor vehicle dealers; waiving certain fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of certain motor vehicle dealers; waiving certain fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1984 (Y: 128 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#808 (Y: 131 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1984
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-25SenateRecord vote
2019-05-25SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-24SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-24HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-24HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-24SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-24SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2019-05-24SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-24SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-24SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-24HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-24HouseHouse requests conference committee
2019-05-24HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateAmended
2019-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Flores
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-01SenateReferred to Administration
2019-05-01SenateRead first time
2019-04-30SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#808
2019-04-30HousePassed
2019-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-29HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2019-03-19HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2052 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Not again placed on intent calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3842
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03842I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03842H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03842E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03842S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03842F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3842&RcdVtNo=808&Ch=H&Dt=04/30/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=58
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3842&RcdVtNo=1984&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=84

Bill Comments 750

feedback