TX HB3842 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an agreement to finance and build a conference center and other appropriate facilities in or near a state park.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an agreement to finance and build a conference center and other appropriate facilities in or near a state park.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-30 - House - HB 3842Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-17 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-17 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2015-05-24SenateRecord vote
2015-05-24SenatePassed
2015-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-24SenateRecord vote
2015-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-05SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2015-05-05SenateRead first time
2015-05-04SenateReceived from the House
2015-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2015-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HouseRecord vote
2015-04-30HousePassed
2015-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HousePassed to engrossment
2015-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-30HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2015-04-27HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-04-21HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-04-14HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-23HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2015-03-23HouseRead first time
2015-03-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback