TX HB3840 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of individuals or business entities that provide or train assistance animals for veterans; providing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to the regulation of individuals or business entities that provide or train assistance animals for veterans; providing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |