TX HB3824 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an affirmative finding of family violence entered in the trial of certain offenses and to service of a notice of a temporary ex parte family violence protective order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an affirmative finding of family violence entered in the trial of certain offenses and to service of a notice of a temporary ex parte family violence protective order.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1176 (Y: 118 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-09SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1176
2019-05-09HousePassed
2019-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-08HouseAmended 1-Bowers
2019-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-07HousePostponed 5/8/19 3:00 PM
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-03-19HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback