TX HB3820 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to health care specialty consultations in certain child abuse or neglect investigations and assessments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health care specialty consultations in certain child abuse or neglect investigations and assessments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-09HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-23HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-03-23HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback