TX HB381 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of the death penalty to a capital offense committed by a person with an intellectual disability.
Title
Relating to the applicability of the death penalty to a capital offense committed by a person with an intellectual disability.
Sponsors
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. John Bryant [D] |
Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] | Rep. Christina Morales [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1315 (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1315 |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-03-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-02-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-02-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-02-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Judges
Courts--Juries
Crimes
Crimes--Capital Punishment
CRIMINAL APPEALS, COURT OF
Disabilities, Persons with
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Courts--Judges
Courts--Juries
Crimes
Crimes--Capital Punishment
CRIMINAL APPEALS, COURT OF
Disabilities, Persons with
Mental Health & Substance Abuse