TX HB3808 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to measures to facilitate the timely graduation of and attainment of marketable skills by students in public higher education.
Title
Relating to measures to facilitate the timely graduation of and attainment of marketable skills by students in public higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Armando Walle [D] | Sen. Beverly Powell [D] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] |
Sen. Royce West [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1996 (Y: 132 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#738 (Y: 126 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1996 (Y: 132 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#738 (Y: 126 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1996 |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | House | House requests conference committee |
2019-05-24 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Taylor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Menéndez |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#738 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1296 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Higher Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS