TX HB3808 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to financial assistance to local governmental entities affected by the realignment of defense jobs or facilities.
Title
Relating to financial assistance to local governmental entities affected by the realignment of defense jobs or facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Military & Veterans
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Military & Veterans