TX HB3808 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to evaluating the performance, including computing dropout and completion rates, of public schools designated as dropout recovery schools.
Title
Relating to evaluating the performance, including computing dropout and completion rates, of public schools designated as dropout recovery schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Marsha Farney [R] | Rep. Charlie Geren [R] | Rep. Diane Patrick [R] | Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D] |
Rep. Patricia Harless [R] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-05-07 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-05-06 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DROPOUTS & AT-RISK STUDENTS
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--School Districts
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--School Districts