TX HB38 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the penalty for an offense involving motor vehicle airbags.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the penalty for an offense involving motor vehicle airbags.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-24 - House - HB 38Third Reading House (Y: 115 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - HB 38Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2013-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2013-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-24HouseRecord vote
2013-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2013-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2013-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2013-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenatePassed
2013-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-16SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-04-17SenateReferred to Transportation
2013-04-17SenateRead first time
2013-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2013-04-10HouseReported engrossed
2013-04-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-04-10HouseRecord vote
2013-04-10HousePassed as amended
2013-04-10HouseAmended
2013-04-10HouseAmended
2013-04-10HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-04-09HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2013-04-09HouseAmended
2013-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-04-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-03-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-03-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-03-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-03-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-03-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-02-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-02-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-04HouseReferred to Transportation
2013-02-04HouseRead first time
2012-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback