TX HB38 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - Laid on the table subject to call

Summary

Relating to resident tuition rates at public institutions of higher education for certain veterans and their spouses and children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to resident tuition rates at public institutions of higher education for certain veterans and their spouses and children.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-07 Laid on the table subject to call
2009-04-07 Companion considered in lieu of
2009-04-07 Postponed
2009-04-07 Laid out as postponed business
2009-04-06 Postponed
2009-04-06 Laid out as postponed business
2009-03-25 Postponed
2009-03-25 Read 2nd time
2009-03-25 Placed on General State Calendar
2009-03-23 Considered in Calendars
2009-03-20 Committee report sent to Calendars
2009-03-19 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-03-19 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-03-18 Reported favorably as substituted
2009-03-18 Committee substitute considered in committee
2009-03-18 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-11 Left pending in committee
2009-03-11 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2009-03-11 Committee substitute considered in committee
2009-03-11 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-11 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-02-12 Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2009-02-12 Read first time
2008-11-10 Filed

Same As/Similar To

SB200 (Similar To) 2009-02-10 - Referred to Higher Education
SB297 (Similar To) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback