TX HB3787 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-25 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-25 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a claim filing period and contractual limitations period in certain property insurance policies.
Title
Relating to a claim filing period and contractual limitations period in certain property insurance policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - House - HB 3787Third Reading House (Y: 105 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 6 by Simpson (Y: 120 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 6 by Simpson (Y: 120 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Tagged |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-14 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-14 | House | Passed |
2015-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-13 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-13 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-13 | House | Amendment tabled |
2015-05-13 | House | Amended |
2015-05-13 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-13 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-12 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-12 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2015-05-12 | House | Point of order overruled (amendment) |
2015-05-12 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-12 | House | Amended |
2015-05-12 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-12 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-12 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-12 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-12 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-12 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-12 | House | Amended |
2015-05-12 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-11 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Insurance
Insurance--Property & Casualty
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
Insurance--Property & Casualty
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property