TX HB3784 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorizing a statewide referendum allowing voters to indicate a preference for observing standard time year-round or observing daylight saving time year-round.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizing a statewide referendum allowing voters to indicate a preference for observing standard time year-round or observing daylight saving time year-round.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#684 (Y: 118 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25HouseRecord vote RV#684
2019-04-25HousePassed
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-24HouseAmendment tabled 2-Smithee
2019-04-24HouseAmended 1-Larson
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-19HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HJR117 (Enabling for) 2019-04-24 - Received from the House

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback