TX HB3784 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain applications to obtain a license to carry a handgun and to the associated handgun proficiency course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain applications to obtain a license to carry a handgun and to the associated handgun proficiency course.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1794 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#664 (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateAmended
2017-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateAmended
2017-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed
2017-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-30HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2017-03-30HouseRead first time
2017-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3784
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03784I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03784H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03784E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03784S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03784F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3784&RcdVtNo=664&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3784&RcdVtNo=1794&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=59
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=56

Bill Comments

feedback