TX HB3777 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 1/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to eligible costs and expenses for purposes of the franchise tax credit for the certified rehabilitation of certified historic structures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to eligible costs and expenses for purposes of the franchise tax credit for the certified rehabilitation of certified historic structures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#746 (Y: 88 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 1/1/22
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed
2021-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Finance
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#746
2021-05-05HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-04HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3777
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03777I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03777H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03777E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03777S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03777F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03777I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03777H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03777H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03777E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03777E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3777&RcdVtNo=746&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=38

Bill Comments 750

feedback