TX HB3771 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the definition of abortion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the definition of abortion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1216 (Y: 101 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#1187 (Y: 95 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-15SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-05-15SenateRead first time
2017-05-15SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-12HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-12HouseRecord vote
2017-05-12HousePassed
2017-05-12HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11HouseRecord vote
2017-05-11HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-11HouseAmendment adopted as amended
2017-05-11HouseAmendment amended
2017-05-11HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-01HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-31HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-31HouseRead first time
2017-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback