TX HB3767 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to measures to support the alignment of education and workforce development in the state with state workforce needs, including the establishment of the Tri-Agency Workforce Initiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to measures to support the alignment of education and workforce development in the state with state workforce needs, including the establishment of the Tri-Agency Workforce Initiative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1613 (Y: 98 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1178 (Y: 115 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1613
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-26HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-26HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-26HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateAmended
2021-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-18SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Higher Education
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1178
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1622 (Same As) 2021-05-14 - Not again placed on intent calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3767
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03767I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03767H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03767E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03767S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03767F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03767S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03767I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03767H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03767H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03767E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03767E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03767S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03767S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03767F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3767&RcdVtNo=1178&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=61
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3767&RcdVtNo=1613&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback