TX HB3756 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to airport police forces, including the authority to commission peace officers and the rights, privileges, and duties of those officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to airport police forces, including the authority to commission peace officers and the rights, privileges, and duties of those officers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2021-05-11HouseWithdrawn from calendar (contested)
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-30HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2021-04-30HouseWithdrawn from calendar (by author)
2021-04-30HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-12HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-31HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1550 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback