TX HB3756 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the methods and procedures used by the comptroller to determine the total taxable value of property in each school district.
Title
Relating to the methods and procedures used by the comptroller to determine the total taxable value of property in each school district.
Sponsors
Rep. John Otto [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-15 - House - HB 3756Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-15 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-15 | House | Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-15 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-15 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-13 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts