TX HB3754 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the collection of local permit and license fees authorized under the Alcoholic Beverage Code; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the collection of local permit and license fees authorized under the Alcoholic Beverage Code; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenatePassed
2019-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-15SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#962
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-16HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-10HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-03-19HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback