TX HB3752 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the offering of health benefit coverage by subsidiaries of the Texas Mutual Insurance Company.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the offering of health benefit coverage by subsidiaries of the Texas Mutual Insurance Company.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1779 (Y: 89 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#727 (Y: 100 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Record vote RV#708 (Y: 89 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#707 (Y: 65 N: 80 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#706 (Y: 70 N: 75 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#705 (Y: 64 N: 80 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-30SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-30HouseRecord vote RV#1779
2021-05-30HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2021-05-30HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-29SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-29HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-29HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-28SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-28SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2021-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-28HouseHouse requests conference committee
2021-05-28HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenatePassed
2021-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#727
2021-05-05HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#708
2021-05-04HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#707
2021-05-04HouseAmendment fails of adoption 6-C. Turner
2021-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#706
2021-05-04HouseAmendment fails of adoption 5-S. Thompson and Davis
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#705
2021-05-04HouseAmendment fails of adoption 4-Israel
2021-05-04HouseAmendment adopted as amended 2-Frank
2021-05-04HouseAmendment amended 3-Zwiener
2021-05-04HouseAmendment(s) offered 2-Frank
2021-05-04HouseAmended 1-Frank
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Insurance
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3752
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03752I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03752H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03752E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03752S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03752F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03752H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03752H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03752H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03752H24.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03752H25.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03752H26.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03752I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03752H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03752H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03752E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03752E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03752S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03752S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03752F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3752&RcdVtNo=705&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3752&RcdVtNo=706&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3752&RcdVtNo=707&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3752&RcdVtNo=708&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3752&RcdVtNo=727&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=100
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=101
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3752&RcdVtNo=1779&Ch=H&Dt=05/30/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=22

Bill Comments 750

feedback