TX HB375 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to classifying elk and elk hybrids as livestock under the Agriculture Code.
Title
Relating to classifying elk and elk hybrids as livestock under the Agriculture Code.
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Estes [R] | Rep. Sid Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Effective immediately | |
2009-05-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-19 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-18 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-15 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-15 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-13 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-13 | Record vote | |
2009-05-13 | Passed | |
2009-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-13 | Record vote | |
2009-05-13 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-13 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-13 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-13 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-04 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | |
2009-04-27 | Read first time | |
2009-04-08 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-07 | Record vote | |
2009-04-07 | Passed as amended | |
2009-04-07 | Amended | |
2009-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-06 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-03-30 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-03-27 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-24 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-12-08 | Filed |